NSW ICAC OPERATION SPICER witness list for week commencing 25 August 2014
Monday 25 August 2014
David Sharpe - former co-owner and executive at BuildDev property developer
Tuesday 26 August 2014
John Hart - chairman of the North Sydney Forum, a fund-raising entity attached to the Liberal Party federal electoral conference in Australian Treasurer Hockey's seat of North Sydney and, CEO of Restaurant and Catering Australia, the national lobby group for the hospitality industry Removed from witness list for second week in a row
David Sharpe - former co-owner and executive at BuildDev property developer
Warwick Watkins – former CEO of NSW Land and Property Management Authority and current director of consultancy business WW & Associates Pty Ltd Removed from witness list this week
Wednesday 27 August 2014
Ross Cadell - NSW Nationals regional co-ordinator, director at R & S Cadell Pty Ltd, manages the trading arm of family businesses including Tiny Tutus Pty Ltd, Tutu Central and P1 Race Engineering Removed from witness list this week
Darren Williams - development manager at the Buildev Group and a sponsor of the Sydney-based Liberal Party associated entity The Millennium Forum in 2008
Thursday 28 August 2014
Darren Williams - development manager at the Buildev Group and a sponsor of the Sydney-based Liberal Party associated entity The Millennium Forum in 2008
Darren Williams - development manager at the Buildev Group and a sponsor of the Sydney-based Liberal Party associated entity The Millennium Forum in 2008
The following removed from this week's witness list:
Friday 29 August 2014
Darren Williams - development manager at the Buildev Group and a sponsor of the Sydney-based Liberal Party associated entity The Millennium Forum in 2008
David Simmons - former Federal Labor MP for Calare, current director of David Simmons Corporate Communications which lists the Buildev Group as a client
Nathan Tinkler - part-owner of Buildev Pty Limited, former Patinack Farm horse stud owner and mining magnate
Tony Kelly - former NSW Labor MLC, former Minister for Lands and later Shadow Minister for Resources and Primary Production, he resigned from parliament after an ICAC investigation found that he had acted corruptly when Minister for Lands
Joe Tripodi - former NSW Labor MP for Fairfield and Minister for Ports and Waterways, in 2010 announced that he would not stand at the 2011 state election after corruption allegations made in ICAC Operation Cyrus hearings concerning his actions as minister
The following removed from this week's witness list:
Darren Williams - development manager at the Buildev Group and a sponsor of the Sydney-based Liberal Party associated entity The Millennium Forum in 2008
David Simmons - former Federal Labor MP for Calare, current director of David Simmons Corporate Communications which lists the Buildev Group as a client
Nathan Tinkler - part-owner of Buildev Pty Limited, former Patinack Farm horse stud owner and mining magnate
Tony Kelly - former NSW Labor MLC, former Minister for Lands and later Shadow Minister for Resources and Primary Production, he resigned from parliament after an ICAC investigation found that he had acted corruptly when Minister for Lands
Joe Tripodi - former NSW Labor MP for Fairfield and Minister for Ports and Waterways, in 2010 announced that he would not stand at the 2011 state election after corruption allegations made in ICAC Operation Cyrus hearings concerning his actions as minister
The following removed from this week's witness list:
No comments:
Post a Comment
Note: only a member of this blog may post a comment.